Financial history HENTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1050967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.74k £21.13k £24.41k £21.58k £18.92k
Total expenditure £10.69k £11.86k £12.06k £15.93k £17.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.67k N/A N/A N/A