Trustees FRIENDS OF LEAFIELD SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1050978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorna Steventon Chair 23 October 2024
None on record
Rhiannon Abberley Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Louise Kenny Trustee 01 September 2023
LEAFIELD PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Kristen Vy Huynh Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Nicola Jane Coggins Trustee 12 September 2022
None on record
Andrew Moxey Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Tina Claudia Drayton Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record