HASTINGS AND ROTHER BOND BOARD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides assistance to individuals who are homeless or in serious housing need in the Hastings and Rother areas of East Sussex by way of the provision of bonds or cash deposits in order to secure private rented accommodation. It also offers tenancy support, a video inventory service, and, until April 2007, a Bond Bank to hold deposits safely, independently and impartially.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 24 November 1995: Standard registration
- 31 December 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HASTINGS AND ROTHER RENT DEPOSIT SCHEME (Working name)
- HASTINGS RENT DEPOSIT SCHEME (Working name)
- THE BOND BANK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.75k | £42.61k | £57.01k | £62.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.02k | £50.18k | £59.32k | £64.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 30 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 15 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 15 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 14 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 14 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN HASTINGS AND ROTHER (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ISSUING BONDS TO LANDLORDS IN LIEU OF CASH DEPOSITS FROM PROSPECTIVE TENANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO OBTAIN ACCOMMODATION THAT THEY WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO SECURE. (2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION INTO THE BARRIERS THAT PREVENT PROVISION OF OR ACCESS TO PRIVATE RENTED ACCOMMODATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-- IN PRACTICE HASTINGS BOROUGH AND ROTHER DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window