Financial history CHURT COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1050987
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £5.40k £817 £6.58k £6.00k £5.78k
Total expenditure £6.04k £99 £5.21k £6.15k £5.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A