THE GEOFF TAYLOR EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS BY ASSISTING THEM TO ATTEND SCHOOLS INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES PARTICULARLY BY PAYING THE FEES OR TRAVELLING AND OTHER INCIDENTAL EXPENSES BY PROVIDING THE SAID PERSON WITH A MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS BY ASSISTING THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION IN SKILLED TRADE INDUSTRIES OR EMPLOYMENT BY MEANS OF APPRENTICESHIP OR TRAINING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 24 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Dixon | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Halton Davis | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Darron Kendrick | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EDWARD PAFFORD | Trustee | 24 November 1995 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £5.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.40k | £10.69k | £10.55k | £8.08k | £4.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA BY ASSISTING THEM TO ATTEND SCHOOLS INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES PARTICULARLY BY PAYING THE FEES OR TRAVELLING AND OTHER INCIDENTAL EXPENSES BY PROVIDING THE SAID PERSON WITH A MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY ASSISTING THEM TO CONTINUE THEIR EDUCATION IN SKILLED TRADE INDUSTRIES OR EMPLOYMENT BY MEANS OF APPRENTICESHIP OR TRAINING.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 COWDRAY CLOSE
WOOLSTONE
MILTON KEYNES
MK15 0AP
- Phone:
- 01908664861
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window