16TH BARNSLEY (ROYSTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Scout Method provides an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training, based on the Scout Promise and Law, which is guided by adult leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
Governance
- 27 November 1995: Standard registration
- ROYSTON SCOUTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penny Austin | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wallace | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Mitchell | Trustee | 15 January 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2018 | 30/07/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.26k | £16.20k | £13.62k | £6.13k | £10.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.79k | £14.02k | £9.67k | £5.92k | £10.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Wharncliffe Court
Carlton
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S71 3BY
- Phone:
- 01226723062
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window