Accounts and annual returns NORTH EAST WALES NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1051063
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 31 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 20 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 15 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 16 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time