GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Guildford and District Group of Advanced Motorists offers guidance and advice to any driver wishing to take the Advanced Driving test. We also provide talks and driving assessments for any member of the public. Our aim is to promote driving safety within our geographic area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 November 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Farquharson | Chair | 28 September 2019 |
|
|||||
John Holcroft | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jeremy Guest | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Tilney | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul Whitehead | Trustee | 21 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £1.89k | £2.47k | £2.67k | £2.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.31k | £1.06k | £1.01k | £2.57k | £2.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 17 MAY 1994 as amended on 06 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burnt House
Zephon Common
Crookham Village
FLEET
Hants
GU51 5SX
- Phone:
- 07940 143580
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window