Financial history PALACE FOR ALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1051112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £136.74k £66.23k £80.79k £125.85k £133.30k
Total expenditure £119.82k £52.76k £90.00k £120.81k £137.05k
Income from government contracts £90.00k £30.70k £62.94k £101.59k £106.25k
Income from government grants £23.77k £23.77k £17.83k £23.77k £23.93k