NORTH WEST SUFFOLK DIVISION

Charity Number: 1051140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To coordinate the Guiding activities in the area of North West Suffolk

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £6,728
Total expenditure: £15,951

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jannette Elizabeth Butler Trustee 22 February 2023
GT BARTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
SUFFOLK COUNTY GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Vivienne Ann Hunt Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Lauren Dian Nightingale-Roffe Mrs Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £473 £1.61k £8.53k £10.69k £6.73k
Total expenditure £2.95k £450 £5.68k £9.14k £15.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.85k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
59a Kings Road
Bury St. Edmunds
IP33 3DR
Phone:
01284 768520
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available