ASHLEY LODGE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1051143
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Total income: £1,060
Total expenditure: £789
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Disability
Who the charity helps:
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 November 1995: Standard registration
- 27 January 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £789 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 15 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM A LEARNING DISABILITY (MENTAL HANDICAP) WITHIN THE AREA OF WINCHFIELD
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
WINCHFIELD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window