HAYDON HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Haydon Hill 2. Maintain and manage a community centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,672 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 30 November 1995: Standard registration
- H H C A (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL RAIMBACH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pam Hayton | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hayton | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Hartley | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Glasson | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mynott | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Mynott | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Patamia | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
pauline stiefel | Trustee | 29 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SHEPPARD | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN FOSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.42k | £10.84k | £25.74k | £22.38k | £23.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.34k | £12.66k | £25.97k | £19.91k | £19.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.76k | £9.76k | £9.76k | £9.76k | £9.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1983, 24 MAY 1992, 23 SEPTEMBER 1992, 24 OCTOBER 1995 AND 30TH AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO COOPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
HAYDON HILL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
DICKENS WAY
AYLESBURY
BUCKS
HP19 8SR
- Phone:
- 07909 796426
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window