ARTHROPLASTY FOR ARTHRITIS CHARITY

Charity Number: 1051165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Research, treatment and causes of arthritis

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £49,236
Total expenditure: £41,538

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ARTHROPLASTY FOR ARTHRITIS FUND (Previous name)
  • ARTHROPLASTY FOR ARTHRITIS FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW PORTEOUS Trustee 01 July 2024
THE BRISTOL KNEE CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
Philip Collard Trustee 20 May 2023
None on record
Mehool Acharya Trustee 20 May 2023
None on record
ROGER SIMON PROCTOR Trustee 28 July 2020
None on record
Jeremy Martin Latham Trustee 25 June 2016
None on record
Dr DAVID COATES Trustee 28 April 2015
None on record
DR DIANA MARY POMEROY Trustee 29 July 2012
None on record
Dr DANIELA SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £61.70k £59.82k £53.02k £59.33k £49.24k
Total expenditure £22.98k £37.36k £127.12k £53.17k £41.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 27 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 13 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 13 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 18 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 15 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
57 CALLICROFT ROAD
PATCHWAY
BRISTOL
BS34 5BU
Phone:
01179804027
Website:

a4ach.org