NORFOLK COMMUNITY HEALTH AND CARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1051173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Norfolk Community Health and Care NHS Trust Charitable Fund supports and improves patient services and provides support for families and carers of NHS patients across Norfolk. It supports services and activities delivered within the community, in clinics and in people's homes. It also supports patients in Community hospitals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £154,000
Total expenditure: £391,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NORFOLK COMMUNITY HEALTH AND CARE NHS TRUST (Previous name)
  • NORFOLK PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
  • NORWICH COMMUNITY HEALTH PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST (Previous name)
  • NORWICH COMMUNITY HEALTH PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
  • NORWICH PRIMARY CARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NORFOLK COMMUNITY HEALTH AND CARE NHS TRUST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £201.00k £358.00k £111.00k £221.99k £154.00k
Total expenditure £190.00k £295.00k £165.00k £319.95k £391.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/11/2010
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AT OR IN CONNECTION WITH NORWICH COMMUNITY HOSPITALS WHICH WILL FURTHER THE FOLLOWING AIMS: A) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN TREATED AT THE HOSPITAL; OR B) FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES BY THE STAFF OF THE HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 24 September 1997 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Norwich Community Hospital
Bowthorpe Road
Norwich
Norfolk
NR2 3TU
Phone:
01603272572