Accounts and annual returns BRITISH AMPUTEE AND LES AUTRES SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051180
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required