Financial history THE WARWICK SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1051181
Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £88.02k £23.20k £8.15k £1.42k £995
Total expenditure £86.77k £18.66k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A