Financial history THE SEBASTIAN PEARSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.23k £10.92k £9.93k £11.25k £21.45k
Total expenditure £29.21k £22.18k £23.40k £26.23k £22.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A