Governing document TAG
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 1995, 17 JANUARY 1996 AND 15 APRIL 1998, AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2002 AND 27TH OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH IMPAIRMENT OF HEARING AND/OR SPEECH BY ENSURING THAT AS FAR AS POSSIBLE ALL FORMS OF ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS SHALL BE AVAILABLE TO DEAF AND SPEECH IMPAIRED PEOPLE AT EQUIVALENT COST AND EASE OF USE AS FOR PEOPLE WITH NO IMPAIRMENT OF SPEECH AND HEARING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE U K
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.