Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HUNGERFORD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1051242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.54k £4.31k £12.67k £10.36k £10.00k
Total expenditure £8.99k £5.79k £10.22k £8.11k £11.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A