ST. GEORGE'S CENTRE CALSHOT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YOUTH CLUB,AFTER SCHOOL GROUP,PLAY GROUP,VARIOUS COMMUNITY GROUPS,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
People

5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 06 December 1995: Standard registration
- ST GEORGE'S HALL CALSHOT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.96k | £3.52k | £1.86k | £1.85k | £2.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.28k | £3.11k | £1.60k | £1.15k | £2.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGES OF CALSHOT AND FAWLEY IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, VILLAGES OF FAWLEY AND CALSHOT
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 TRISTAN CLOSE
CALSHOT
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 1BN
- Phone:
- 02380970979
- Email:
- info@sgcc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window