BRISTOL AREA CARDIAC SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bristol Area Cardiac Support formally Frenchay Hospital Cardiac Support Group was set up to give support to Members who had suffered Cardiac Trauma and had been cared for in Ward 103 in Frenchay Hospital, near Bristol. with the closing of Frenchay Hospital We now raise funds to purchase mediacl equipment when requested by Cardiac Medical Units in the Bristol area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 December 1995: Standard registration
- BRISTOL CARDIAC SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- FRENCHAY HOSPITAL CARDIAC SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- FRENCHAY HOSPITAL CARDIAC SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- FRENCHAY HOSPITALCARDIAC SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MALC ARNOLD VICE CHAIRMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mrs GILLIAN FILER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.39k | £14.91k | £17.00k | £15.00k | £14.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.30k | £12.57k | £15.74k | £14.40k | £12.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.00k | £14.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/1995 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1996 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 03/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF CARDIAC DISEASE AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ESSENTIAL EQUIPMENT FOR THE CARE OF CARDIAC PATIENTS TO HOSPITALS AND OTHER MEDICAL CENTRES THROUGHOUT BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE AVON AND GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 MAPLE AVENUE
BRISTOL
BS16 4HF
- Phone:
- 07723394748
- Email:
- malcarnold194@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
bristolareacardiacsupport.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window