Accounts and annual returns NORFOLK AND NORWICH GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity number: 1051282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required