Accounts and annual returns THE DARELL SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051303
Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required