MARKET HARBOROUGH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1051314
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2004

Total income: £1,031
Total expenditure: £1,059

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 December 1995: Standard registration
  • 12 January 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • MARKET HARBOROUGH W.I. (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004
Total gross income £1.03k
Total expenditure £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2004 24 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2004 Not Required