Trustees Wonder Arts Limited
Charity Number: 1051317

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isah-Levi Jacob Green Roach | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chad Taylor | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Louise McGibbon | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Camilleri | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Phil Gwilliam | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joe Gilmour-Rees | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME DIXON | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
CARL DAVID BEER | Trustee | 13 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.