THE AMERICAN INDIAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 December 1995: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- A I T (Working name)
- AIT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 30 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN NATIVE AMERICAN CULTURE B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ESTABLISHING A WORLD CULTURAL MUSEUM C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR AMONGST NATIVE AMERICANS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window