THE FRIENDS OF ST. OSMUNDS CHURCH, MELBURY OSMOND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds, by various events and activities, to assist the Parochial Church Council in maintaining and enhancing the fabric of St. Osmund's Church and the churchyard in Melbury Osmond, Dorset. The friends also hope to extend interest in the church and in its well-being beyond the confines of the parish itself. St. Osmund's is a "Thomas Hardy Church" as his parents were married here in 1839.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 08 December 1995: Standard registration
- 31 July 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST OSMUNDS CHURCH (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST. OSMONDS CHURCH MELBURY OSMOND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.08k | £3.17k | £1.67k | £3.35k | £787 | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £3.68k | £338 | £0 | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST. OSMOND, MELBURY OSMOND, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE VILLAGE AND PARISH OF MELBURY OSMOND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window