THE SAFFRON WALDEN YOUTH OUTREACH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with the young people of Saffron Walden and the surrounding area. Our main current activities are the Tuesday evening outreach and the Wednesday open centre youth club night at the multi-use centre at Fairycroft. We also have ongoing area specific youth outreach projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 08 December 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE HIBBS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Alexander Reeve | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Healey | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Baxter | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Maurice Ede | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY SCOTT | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £575 | £4.75k | £3.41k | £12.50k | £12.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.92k | £11.04k | £9.54k | £8.64k | £8.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 1ST NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SAFFRON WALDEN, PARTICULARLY THOSE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 13 AND 17 YEARS, BY ASSOCIATING THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS, INSTITUTIONS AND PEOPLE RESIDENT IN OR WORKING IN OR VISITING SAFFRON WALDEN IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEF POVERTY AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTRESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE WHO LIVE IN SAFFRON WALDEN
Area of benefit
SAFFRON, WALDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 MOUNT PLEASANT COTTAGES
DEBDEN ROAD
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 4AE
- Phone:
- 01799525205
- Email:
- saffronwaldenyop@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window