Trustees POTTERS CROSS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1051336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RACHEL CLARE BAKER Chair 28 January 2020
None on record
Gregory Wright Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Harriet O'Reilly Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Claire Bowen Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Pippa McLean Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
Charlotte Wood Trustee 21 June 2019
None on record
Rebecca Johns Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
Stephanie Warwick Trustee 01 November 2014
None on record
MICHELLE WEAVER Trustee 14 March 2011
None on record