Financial history FRIENDS OF MILLHOUSES PARK

Charity number: 1051391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £73 £3.15k £638 £8.19k £3.20k
Total expenditure £2.19k £58 £48 £3.46k £8.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A