FRIENDS OF MILLHOUSES PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities in Millhouses Park in the interests of social welfare, recreation and leisure time for the local community and for the citizens of Sheffield. To increase the enjoyment, relaxation and health and safety of all those who use the park, and to encourage greater use of the park. To stimulate the development of children and young people across a range of ages and abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 12 December 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE KIDDER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD ARTHUR EXELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73 | £3.15k | £638 | £8.19k | £3.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £58 | £48 | £3.46k | £8.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED 8 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN MILLHOUSES PARK AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS AND QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF MILLHOUSES AND FOR THE CITIZENS OF SHEFFIELD (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND, IN PARTICULAR TO STIMULATE PHYSICAL, CREATIVE. IMAGINATIVE, SOCIAL AND COGNITIVE DEVELOPMENT BY PROMOTING,SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING IN THE IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORICAL, PUBLIC AND ENVIRONMENTAL INTEREST IN MILLHOUSES PARK
Area of benefit
MILLHOUSES AND SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 DUNKELD ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S11 9HN
- Phone:
- 07474007596
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window