Financial history COINS TRUST

Charity number: 1051406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £42.79k £19.64k £30.97k £26.22k £21.41k
Total expenditure £34.19k £25.69k £25.69k £20.43k £28.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A