COINS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are defined as: to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs appearing in the Schedule to the Trust deed in Newbury and the surrounding area particularly amongst children and young people in the schools and other educational establishments in the said area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 12 December 1995: Standard registration
- COINS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Lupton | Chair | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Kingston | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hilliard | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Timms | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER BRADLEY | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.79k | £19.64k | £30.97k | £26.22k | £21.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.19k | £25.69k | £25.69k | £20.43k | £28.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN NEWBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID AREA.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, NEWBURY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairacre
Speen Lane
NEWBURY
Berkshire
RG14 1RW
- Phone:
- 07990971963
- Email:
- admin@coinsnewbury.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window