THE PARENT HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parent House provides mentoring, training and support for parents and carers of children around Islington and Kings Cross to enable them to enter employment, enhance their qualifications,knowledge and/ imorove their well-being. By helping these key people within social groups, the charity helps their families and their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £62,988 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- Islington
Governance
- 15 December 1995: Standard registration
- THE PARENT HOUSE (Working name)
- WINTON AND CO (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Segal | Chair | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Lucker | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Barbara Tontschy Eleanor Gerig | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Barbara Ann Ford | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorraine Walker | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|||||
MARGARET JANE FULFORD OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.70k | £271.02k | £314.24k | £197.57k | £265.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.37k | £227.02k | £254.65k | £288.46k | £301.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £17.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.56k | N/A | £18.50k | £62.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/12/2013
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS: (A) TO ADVANCE THE WELL-BEING AND DEVELOPMENT OF PARENTS, CARERS AND CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT AND VOLUNTARY WORK, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PROGRAMMES FOR LITERACY, NUMERACY AND OTHER BASIC SKILLS INCLUDING INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY, LANGUAGE CLASSES AND COMMUNITY AND FAMILY LEARNING, AND ALSO THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, MENTORING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON EDUCATION, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT, FINANCE AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE AND EMPLOYMENT AND THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES AND SUPPORT AS PARENTS AND CARERS MAY REASONABLY REQUIRE SO AS TO BENEFIT BOTH THEM, THEIR CHILDREN AND THE COMMUNITY; (B) TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND PROMOTE HEALTH INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND CLASSES ON HEALTH, NUTRITION AND CHILD CARE; (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS, INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT, THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES AND CHILD CARE AND THE PROVISION OF GUIDANCE ON EDUCATION, TRAINING AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR WORK AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE FOR PARENTS, CARERS, REFUGEES, ETHNIC MINORITIES, DISPLACED PEOPLE AND OTHER DEPRIVED AND NEEDY GROUPS IN THE COMMUNITY; (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (E) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR OBJECTS SIMILAR TO ANY OR ALL OF THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE AND THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR SUCH OBJECT OR OBJECTS BY PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING PROGRAMMES AND MODELS OF ACTIVITY, PROJECTS OF GOOD PRACTICE DEVELOPED OR CARRIED OUT BY THE CHARITY TO COMMUNITIES, ORGANISATIONS AND SCHOOLS NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY IN ANY APPROPRIATE FORM OR FORMAT, AND BY THE DELIVERY OF SERVICES GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PARENT HOUSE
55 CALSHOT STREET
LONDON
N1 9AS
- Phone:
- 02078371383
- Email:
- info@theparenthouse.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window