BUCKNELL MEMORIAL HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE EXIST TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR VILLAGERS AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
Governance
- 14 December 1995: Standard registration
- BUCKNELL MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA JANE EDWARDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Roger Stanley Bates | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Burke | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH PRICE | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Hughes | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Robert Barrett | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Derek Noel Meredith | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Burwell Bowen | Trustee | 08 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ANN EDITH EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.23k | £19.52k | £8.30k | £7.08k | £6.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £4.24k | £5.19k | £6.24k | £7.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.83k | £17.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 11TH MARCH 2005 as amended on 25 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR : (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (2) TO ACQUIRE AND MANAGE AN OPEN SPACE KNOWN AS THE BUCKNELL RECREATION GROUND AND NEIGHBOURHOOD DOORSTEP GREEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION, PLAY OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, A MEETING AREA OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE CONSISTENT WITH THESE TRUSTS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. (3) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BUCKNELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELMONT GARAGE
BUCKNELL
SHROPSHIRE
SY7 0AA
- Phone:
- 01547530085
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window