Accounts and annual returns WANZA SAMAJ U.K.

Charity Number: 1051458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 May 2023 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 May 2022 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 November 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required