SOUTH WINGFIELD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Early Years learning setting registered with Ofsted, for ages 2- 5. Open every day for Pre-School activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 December 1995: Standard registration
- SOUTH WINGFIELD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alannah Siobhan Noble | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jasmin Dods | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Davis | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Mills | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Scott | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
laura byrne | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Watson | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Johnson-Sadler | Trustee | 16 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Shimwell | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.62k | £64.92k | £64.92k | £80.73k | £98.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.42k | £51.77k | £51.77k | £75.37k | £103.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.09k | £250 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 July 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 July 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2021 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2021 | 315 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1979 AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1994 AND 27 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 Victoria Hall Gardens
MATLOCK
Derbyshire
DE4 3SQ
- Phone:
- 07850651858
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window