THE NORTH TYNESIDE CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1051472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The organisation aims to improve the quality of life for carers in North Tyneside by supporting them through a high quality service, shaped by carers' needs and is accessible to all carers. Activities include: information & advocacy, emotional support, support groups, training for carers, counselling, carer assessments, the provision of a breaks and activities service and family support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • North Tyneside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 December 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NORTH TYNESIDE CARERS CENTRE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Mark Baldwin Chair 03 February 2021
NORTH TYNESIDE ACADEMY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
TYNEMOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
4TH TYNEMOUTH (CONGERS) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
WALLSEND ACTION FOR YOUTH (WAFY)
Received: 5 days late
WALLSEND CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY
Recently registered
Beverley Reid Trustee 01 May 2025
None on record
Zara Scott Trustee 24 March 2025
None on record
Jonathan Paul Clark Trustee 06 March 2025
None on record
Joanne Thomas Trustee 05 February 2025
None on record
Kirsty Jameson Trustee 24 December 2024
None on record
William Wilson Trustee 28 February 2024
DEMENTIA MATTERS
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
Karl James Watson Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
Peter Earley Trustee 23 November 2016
THE BASEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
Paul Waggott Trustee 27 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £596.10k £847.51k £756.86k £757.51k £937.64k
Total expenditure £590.74k £813.39k £758.28k £726.98k £930.03k
Income from government contracts £186.79k £271.45k £306.70k £313.77k £440.84k
Income from government grants N/A £1.55k £10.05k £8.61k £6.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.61k £2.25k £1.47k £8.15k £693
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £581.57k £830.21k £746.80k £739.25k £900.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.57k £2.82k £1.25k £2.28k £5.26k
Income - Other £10.34k £12.23k £7.35k £7.84k £30.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £590.74k £813.39k £758.28k £726.98k £930.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.57k £12.96k £15.62k £13.19k £21.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £622 £607 £1.16k £989 £219
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £374.18k £351.51k £427.16k £448.22k £363.51k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £166.85k £110.04k £187.67k £178.03k £84.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Floor 2
Wallsend Customer First Centre
16 The Forum
Wallsend
Tyne and Wear
NE28 8JR
Phone:
01912496480