THE WAY-OUT SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FORTNIGHTLY MEETINGS. MEMBERS INTERACTING TO ENSURE THEIR MUTUAL WELFARE. ANNUAL GET TOGETHER AT CHRISTMAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 December 1995: Standard registration
- 03 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £717 | £325 | £450 | £101 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £739 | £251 | £309 | £566 | £595 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 03 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 05 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16TH MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NORWICH, AND ELSEWHERE IN NORFOLK, WHO ARE AGORAPHOBICS.
Area of benefit
NORWICH AND ELSEWHERE IN NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window