LAMPETER MUSIC CLUB

Charity number: 1051509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of an annual series of Classical Music concerts in Lampeter, for people in nearby Ceredigion and Carmarthenshire, including workshops for younger and older people. Promotion of interest and understanding of such music for all.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £5,146
Total expenditure: £5,625

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Carmarthenshire
  • Ceredigion

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Glynis Florence Chair 02 October 2020
None on record
Judith Anne Aston Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Dr STEPHEN GERENT ROWLANDS Trustee 02 October 2020
None on record
CAROL ELIZABETH NIXON Trustee 19 November 2017
FRIENDS OF MUSICFEST ABERYSTWYTH
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE ARTS CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.53k £1.99k £9.40k £5.52k £5.15k
Total expenditure £2.97k £1.31k £9.95k £3.85k £5.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PANTYNOS
TY MAWR
LLANYBYDDER
SA40 9RE
Phone:
01570480083