THE CAMBRIDGE SAWSTON ROTARY TRUST

Charity Number: 1051512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £37,314
Total expenditure: £40,049

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ROTARY CLUB OF CAMBRIDGE SAWSTON (Previous name)
  • ROTARY CLUB OF SAWSTON DISTRICT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr William Duncan Potter Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Sallly Ann Stewart Trustee 21 December 2021
None on record
Peter White Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.25k £28.56k £23.78k £26.69k £37.31k
Total expenditure £13.53k £25.60k £15.96k £31.13k £40.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £500 N/A £500

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 24 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 July 2024 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 July 2024 90 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 13 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 ORWELL ROAD
BARRINGTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 7SE
Phone:
01223872243