DAISY BANK GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 1051520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Social, recreational & developmental activities for adults who have learning disabilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,523
Total expenditure: £7,897

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 1995: Standard registration
  • 15 November 2022: Funds received from 1106133 BRICKKILN DUNSTALL GATEWAY CLUB
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DAISYBANK GATEWAY CLUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET Noreen COPE Chair 15 January 2013
None on record
Lynne Joanne Jackson Trustee 16 May 2018
None on record
Kellie Jayne Hosell Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.72k £6.71k £13.76k £4.56k £4.52k
Total expenditure £9.47k £5.99k £3.70k £5.72k £7.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 DEREHAM WALK
BILSTON
WV14 8PR
Phone:
01902822109
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available