THE KANDE SAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- Japan
Governance
- 19 December 1995: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.19k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.15k | £2.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 20 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND JAPAN IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO UNDERTAKE CULTURAL EXCHANGE VISITS AND TO ATTEND SEMINARS SPECIAL EVENTS AND BRIEFINGS (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE JAPANESE CHURCH IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING IN THEIR WORK AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE (C) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND JAPAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window