Trustees SLEIGHTS SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1051529

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristie Price | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Taylor | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Scott Grason | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jane Carter | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jones | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Coomber | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Gail Wilson | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diane Exelby | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV VERONICA CAROLAN | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
THERESA WALL | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA BROWN | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA KELLERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.