Accounts and annual returns CENTRAL SUSSEX BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required