MADINA MOSQUE AND MUSLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides various facilities to the local Islamic community, the main one being the provision of prayers 5 times per day. Other facilities provided include: facilities for weddings, funeral preparations and prayers. The Mosque also provides Islamic education and holds sporting activities for a wide range of children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bolton
Governance
- 20 December 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irfan Akream | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
shahbaz ahmed khan khan | Trustee | 21 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiaz Khan | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Munir Ahmed | Trustee | 28 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad asif | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Khalil Ahmed choudhry | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NASIR AHMED | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
majid dad | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
mohammad afzal | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANJUM HANIF | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR MIAH KHAN | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SALEEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMAD HANIF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.32k | £93.02k | £122.23k | £136.31k | £117.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.48k | £77.89k | £95.29k | £70.80k | £79.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 July 2023 | 245 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE TEACHING OF URDU (3) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE OF THE MUSLIM FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 CHORLEY NEW ROAD
HEATON
BOLTON
BL1 4DH
- Phone:
- 07711060216
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window