SOUTH CLEVELAND HEART FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness by the provision of facilities and medical equipment for use at the Heart Unit at the James Cook University Hospital (formerly South Cleveland Hospital) and at associated units.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 20 December 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ADRIAN DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ruby Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Brunton | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John O'Connor | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SAM HUSSAIN | Trustee | 02 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
AMY OXLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
TRACY WOOD | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.92k | £89.17k | £37.89k | £63.91k | £97.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.06k | £129.78k | £13.85k | £328.43k | £5.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR THE USE AT THE HEART UNIT AT THE SOUTH CLEVELAND HOSPITAL AND AT ASSOCIATED UNITS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 ROMAN ROAD
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS5 5QB
- Phone:
- 01642824788
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window