Financial history BLACKPOOL TEACHING HOSPITALS CHARITABLE FUND AND RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 1051570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.32m £752.72k £480.32k £1.08m £1.31m
Total expenditure £1.15m £1.02m £621.64k £775.08k £1.89m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.31m £752.72k N/A £941.65k £931.37k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £105.73k £307.66k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.24k £0 N/A £29.27k £66.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £884.09k £278.56k N/A £462.92k £361.43k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £922.53k £814.38k N/A £445.48k £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £226.24k £209.85k N/A £329.59k £405.25k
Expenditure - Governance £44.16k £42.21k N/A £44.07k £41.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0