Governing document COPPICE JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1051576

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1971 AS AMENDED 6 OCTOBER 1986, 2 OCTOBER 1991, 7 OCTOBER 1992, 5 OCTOBER 1995, 30 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.