Accounts and annual returns MAYBANK INFANTS SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1051586
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 20 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 22 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required